NH HB1164 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 67; eff. 8/13/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to criminal records checks of teacher credentialing applicants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to criminal records checks of teacher credentialing applicants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 67; eff. 8/13/2024 House Journal 16
2024-06-10HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 36
2024-06-10SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/30/2024); Senate Journal 17
2024-04-26SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
2024-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2024-03-20SenateHearing: 03/26/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13
2024-02-16SenateIntroduced 02/15/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5
2024-02-01HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 7
2024-01-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass 01/18/2024 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 6
2024-01-17HouseExecutive Session: 01/24/2024 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2024-01-05HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-11-28HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback