NH HB1164 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerning support for cats and dogs that are neglected or treated cruelly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning support for cats and dogs that are neglected or treated cruelly.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 60
2020-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2020-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback