NH HB1160 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing municipalities to collect an occupancy fee from operators of local room rentals.
Title
Allowing municipalities to collect an occupancy fee from operators of local room rentals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - OTP (Y: 174 N: 113 NV: 64 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 174-113 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 170 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 67 |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/03/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-19 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/04/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 104 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 11 |