NH HB116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 193-165 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 193-165 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to assessing the consequences of the Citizens United decision.
Title
Relative to assessing the consequences of the Citizens United decision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 193-165 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2017-03-08 | House | Special Order to first order of business on 3/9/2017 (Rep. White): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 78 |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-02-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 01:20 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 17 |