NH HB1158 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the adoption of bylaws and ordinances by municipalities.
Title
Relative to the adoption of bylaws and ordinances by municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 22 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-02-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 34 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 11 |