NH HB1152 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enabling the mental health flag to be flown at the state house.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enabling the mental health flag to be flown at the state house.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 71
2024-02-15HouseRemoved from Consent (Reps. McLean, Schapiro, Wheeler, J. Murphy, Shurtleff, Lascelles, Simpson, Proulx, Gagne, Preece) 02/14/2024 House Journal 5 P. 6
2024-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/31/2024 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 7
2024-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 01/31/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2024-01-17HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2023-11-28HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Legislative Administration

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback