NH HB1151 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 63; eff. 8/13/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the carrying of alcoholic beverages on hotel premises and monthly deposits from the liquor commission to the general fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the carrying of alcoholic beverages on hotel premises and monthly deposits from the liquor commission to the general fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 63; eff. 8/13/2024 House Journal 16
2024-06-10HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 36
2024-06-10SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/30/2024); Senate Journal 17
2024-04-26SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
2024-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2024-04-18Senate===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 04/24/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 16
2024-04-02SenateIntroduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 8
2024-03-28HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2024-0768h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 6
2024-03-28HouseAmendment # 2024-0768h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 6
2024-03-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0768h (NT) 03/13/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 5
2024-03-07HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2024-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2024-02-07HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2024-01-31HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
2024-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2024 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2023-11-28HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback