NH HB1151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-141 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-141 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the display of a deadly weapon at a parade, funeral procession, picket line, march, rally, vigil, or demonstration.
Title
Prohibiting the display of a deadly weapon at a parade, funeral procession, picket line, march, rally, vigil, or demonstration.
Sponsors
Rep. David Meuse [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] |
Rep. Ray Newman [D] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] | Rep. Joyce Weston [D] | Rep. Nicole Klein-Knight [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - ITL (Y: 192 N: 141 NV: 57 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-141 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-02-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2022 01:30 pm State House Reps Hall |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |