NH HB115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2204s (Rep. Goley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the regulation of private investigators, security guards, and bail recovery agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the regulation of private investigators, security guards, and bail recovery agents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2204s (Rep. Goley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2204s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2204s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2204s, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24
2019-05-02Senate==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 05/16/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 21
2019-04-25Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 05/15/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 11
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 5
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 38

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback