NH HB115 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 222; Effective Date 7/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 222; Effective Date 7/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reports on gross appropriations from the highway fund in the tentative state budget and defining autocycle and making provisions for the operation and inspection of autocycles.
Title
Relative to reports on gross appropriations from the highway fund in the tentative state budget and defining autocycle and making provisions for the operation and inspection of autocycles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 222; Effective Date 7/1/2015 |
2015-07-02 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2141 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2777c: Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 54, PG. 2122 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2777c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2015-2777c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2015-06-16 | House | ==Continued==Conference Committee Meeting: 6/16/2015 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 6/16/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201==Recessed== |
2015-06-11 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Stiles, Birdsell and Feltes |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sen. Stiles accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18 |
2015-06-05 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Chandler, Cloutier, Packard, McConkey (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1951 |
2015-06-05 | House | House Non-Concurs and Requests Committee of Conference (Rep Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1951 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1955s, New Title, and 2006s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment #2015-2006s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1955s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1955s, New Title, 6/4/15; Senate Calendar 24 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Hearing: 5/26/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m., on proposed amendment #2015-1840s - relative to reports on gross appropriations from the highway fund in the tentative state budget and defining autocycle and making provisions for the operation and inspection to HB 115, relative to reports on gross appropriations from the highway fund in the tentative state budget; Senate Calendar 23 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Hearing: 4/21/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-02-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0057h Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 14, PG. 275-276 |
2015-02-04 | House | Adopt Amendment 0057h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 14, PG. 276 |
2015-02-04 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2015-0057h (New Title); House Calendar10 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0057h(NT) for Feb 4 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar10, PG. 153 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 1/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-01-20 | House | ==POSTPONED== Executive Session: 1/27/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 7, PG. 117 |