NH HB115 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 08/24/2013; Chapter 0114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 08/24/2013; Chapter 0114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the procedure for filling a vacancy on a cooperative school district budget committee.
Title
Relative to the procedure for filling a vacancy on a cooperative school district budget committee.
Sponsors
Rep. James Belanger [R] | Rep. Jack Flanagan [R] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Sen. Peter Bragdon [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 08/24/2013; Chapter 0114 |
2013-05-30 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 5/29/13; House Journal 45, PG.1527 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1075s (Rep Porter): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1464 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1075s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1075s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1075s, 3/28/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 3/20/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-01-30 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 14, PG.239 |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 30 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.129 |
2013-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/22/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.183 |