NH HB1146 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0122; Effective 6/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0122; Effective 6/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of funding a kindergarten to college/career ready program and a universal college savings account.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of funding a kindergarten to college/career ready program and a universal college savings account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 127 NV: 21 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0122; Effective 6/16/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-14 | House | Concur with Senate Amendment #1255s, (Rep Wallner); Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1255s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1255s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1255s, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/1/14, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance |
2014-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0223h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-127 |
2014-02-19 | House | Adopt Amendment #0223h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0223h for Feb 19 (Vote 16-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/28/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-01-23 | House | Division II Work Session: 1/28/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2014-01-16 | House | Division II Work Session: 1/23/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2014-01-14 | House | Division II Work Session: 1/21/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2014-01-14 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 1/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2014-01-08 | House | Division II Work Session: 1/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Finance |