NH HB1145 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Signed by Governor Hassan 04/15/2016; Chapter 15; Eff. 4/15/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Signed by Governor Hassan 04/15/2016; Chapter 15; Eff. 4/15/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study suspensions and expulsions in licensed preschools and in kindergarten through grade 3.
Title
Establishing a committee to study suspensions and expulsions in licensed preschools and in kindergarten through grade 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. Mary Gorman [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] |
Rep. John Balcom [R] | Rep. Victoria Sullivan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 04/15/2016; Chapter 15; Eff. 4/15/2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/07/2016); Senate Journal 13 |
2016-04-07 | House | Enrolled 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 24 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2016; Senate Journal 11 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2016; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2016, Rooms 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 15 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 10 |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building207 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 3 |