NH HB1144 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring public schools to teach labor history.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring public schools to teach labor history.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-16HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 3
2022-02-03HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
2022-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2022 08:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2022-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2022 03:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
2021-11-17HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback