NH HB1143 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the New Hampshire Law Against Discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the New Hampshire Law Against Discrimination.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-17SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9
2014-04-03SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14
2014-03-20SenateHearing: 4/1/14, Room 100, State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11
2014-03-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to Judiciary
2014-03-13HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0471h Motion Adopted Div 176-100
2014-03-13HouseAdopt Amendment #2014-0471h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote
2014-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2014-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0471h (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14
2014-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2014-01-29House=CONTINUED=Public Hearing: 2/11/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2014-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 1/21/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208=RECESSED=
2013-12-12HouseIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback