NH HB1141 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Executive Session: 03/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Executive Session: 03/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to special education services for children in chartered public schools.
Title
Relative to special education services for children in chartered public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-11 | House | Public Hearing on Amendment # 2022-0119h: 02/25/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |