NH HB1140 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to probate procedures for small estates.
Title
Relative to probate procedures for small estates.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Terry [R] | Rep. Norman Silber [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] |
Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Mark Alliegro [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |