NH HB1138 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - House Signed by the Governor 05/25/2010; Effective 07/24/2010; Chapter 0085
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - House Signed by the Governor 05/25/2010; Effective 07/24/2010; Chapter 0085
Summary
Relative to the authority to expend municipal transportation improvement funds.
Title
Relative to the authority to expend municipal transportation improvement funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | House Signed by the Governor 05/25/2010; Effective 07/24/2010; Chapter 0085 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/28/10 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to 04/28/10 | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/21/10; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Hearing: April 15, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 8:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11, Pg.260 | |
2010-03-10 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1292 | |
2010-02-16 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 10 (Vote 17-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1034 | |
2010-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 (Continued 2/11/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 If Necessary) | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Local and Regulated Revenues; House Journal 6, PG.230 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2080&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |