NH HB1133 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the termination of a lease during the sale of real property.
Title
Prohibiting the termination of a lease during the sale of real property.
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Adjutant [D] | Rep. Chuck Grassie [D] | Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] | Rep. Latha Mangipudi [D] |
Rep. Matthew Wilhelm [D] | Rep. Sherry Frost [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |