NH HB1131 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to facial covering policies for schools.
Title
Relative to facial covering policies for schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 166 N: 157 NV: 27 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 152 N: 168 NV: 30 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 166 N: 157 NV: 27 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 152 N: 168 NV: 30 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-18 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Special Order to after HB 629, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1688s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1688s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1688s, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 03/30/2022, Room 210-211, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | FLAM # 2022-1083h (Rep. Mason): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 152-168 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment hb1131: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 166-157 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2022-0998h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0998h (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/25/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-26 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/27/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |