NH HB1126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-151 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-151 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting minors over the age of 16 to obtain a vaccination without parental consent.
Title
Permitting minors over the age of 16 to obtain a vaccination without parental consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - ITL (Y: 184 N: 151 NV: 55 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-151 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-02-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |