NH HB112 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to domicile for voting purposes.
Title
Relative to domicile for voting purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-03-11 | House | Request opinion of Justices (Rep Hoelzel): Motion Adopted DV 190-148; House Journal 24, PG. 878-880 |
2015-03-11 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Hoelzel): Motion Adopted DV 254-85; House Journal 24, PG. 878-880 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0066h: Amendment Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 878-880 |
2015-02-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-02-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0066h for Mar 11 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 421-422 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 7, PG. 117 |