NH HB1115 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 282-6 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 282-6 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the discharge of a firearm in the compact part of a city or town.
Title
Relative to the discharge of a firearm in the compact part of a city or town.
Sponsors
Rep. David Doherty [D] | Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] | Rep. Michelle St. John [D] | Rep. Kat McGhee [D] |
Rep. Andrew Bouldin [D] | Rep. David Coursin [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - ITL (Y: 282 N: 6 NV: 63 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 282-6 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 167 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 17-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 67 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 10 |