NH HB111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/16/2013; Effective 07/15/2013; Chapter 0017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/16/2013; Effective 07/15/2013; Chapter 0017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the acquisition of property rights at Akers Pond dam in the town of Errol by the fish and game department and the acquisition of property rights at Northwood Lake dam in the town of Epsom and Hermit Lake dam in the town of Sanbornton by the department of environmental services.
Title
Relative to the acquisition of property rights at Akers Pond dam in the town of Errol by the fish and game department and the acquisition of property rights at Northwood Lake dam in the town of Epsom and Hermit Lake dam in the town of Sanbornton by the department of environmental services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor 05/16/2013; Effective 07/15/2013; Chapter 0017 |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 3/27/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-01-30 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0014h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 14, PG.239-240 |
2013-01-30 | House | Amendment #0014h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 14, PG.239-240 |
2013-01-24 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0014h (New Title); House Calendar 10, PG.145-146 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0014h(NT) for Jan 30 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.129-130 |
2013-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/22/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/15/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.182 |