NH HB111 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 07/08/2011; Chapter 0041
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 07/08/2011; Chapter 0041
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to redispensing unused drugs.
Title
Relative to redispensing unused drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 07/08/2011; Chapter 0041 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 15, Pg.293 | |
2011-04-27 | House Enrolled; House Journal 40, PG.1386 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.254 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.250 | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Hearing: 3/24/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9, Pg.102 | |
2011-02-09 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.312 | |
2011-01-25 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 9 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.147 | |
2011-01-20 | House Executive Session: 1/25/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-01-11 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-01-03 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 8, PG.130 |