NH HB1108 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the methods of taking turkey during youth turkey hunt weekend.
Title
Relative to the methods of taking turkey during youth turkey hunt weekend.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Robert L'Heureux [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] | Rep. Ed Comeau [R] |
Rep. Jason Janvrin [R] | Rep. David Love [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 30 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 18 |
2020-02-18 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 1 P. 9 |