NH HB1104 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 60; eff. 1/1/2025 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the review of decisions in cases involving judicial misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the review of decisions in cases involving judicial misconduct.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 60; eff. 1/1/2025 House Journal 16
2024-06-10HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 36
2024-06-10SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/30/2024); Senate Journal 17
2024-04-26SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
2024-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2024-03-20SenateHearing: 03/26/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2024-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2024-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2024-0707h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 17
2024-03-07HouseAmendment # 2024-0707h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 17
2024-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0707h 02/21/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 10
2024-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/15/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2024-01-17HousePublic Hearing: 02/07/2024 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2023-11-28HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback