NH HB110 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/31/2016; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to placement of political advertising.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to placement of political advertising.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-31SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/31/2016; Senate Journal 11
2016-03-23SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/31/2016; Senate Calendar 12
2016-03-09SenateHearing: 03/16/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2016-02-22SenateIntroduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6
2016-01-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2395h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 34
2016-01-06HouseAmendment #2015-2395h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 34
2015-11-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2395h for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 6
2015-09-15HouseExecutive Session: 10/20/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2015-08-26HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/16/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-02-17HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-11HouseExecutive Session: 2/17/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-01-30House==CANCELED== Executive Session: 2/4/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2015-01-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 1/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 1/20/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2015-01-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 7, PG. 117

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback