NH HB1096 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 190-153 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 190-153 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting open carrying or display of a deadly weapon within 100 feet of a polling place.
Title
Prohibiting open carrying or display of a deadly weapon within 100 feet of a polling place.
Sponsors
Rep. David Meuse [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Gerald Ward [D] | Rep. Ray Newman [D] |
Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Joyce Weston [D] | Rep. Amy Bradley [D] | Rep. Joan Hamblet [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - ITL (Y: 190 N: 153 NV: 16 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 190-153 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-02-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-02-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2022 02:15 pm State House Reps Hall |
2021-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |