NH HB1093 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-161 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-161 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the licensure of nonresident aliens temporarily residing in New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to the licensure of nonresident aliens temporarily residing in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - ITL (Y: 186 N: 161 NV: 15 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-161 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2022 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-11-16 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Transportation |