NH HB1090 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the requirement to register "farmers' market" as a trade name.
Title
Repealing the requirement to register "farmers' market" as a trade name.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/20/2024 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 4 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-03-13 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/19/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/13/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-26 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-24 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |