NH HB1090 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Lay HB1090 on Table (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 165-153 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Lay HB1090 on Table (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 165-153 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to teaching on discrimination in the public schools.
Title
Relative to teaching on discrimination in the public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] | Rep. Diane Langley [D] | Rep. David Cote [D] | Rep. Alexis Simpson [D] |
Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Peter Petrigno [D] | Rep. Linda Harriott-Gathright [D] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - Table (Y: 165 N: 153 NV: 32 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Lay HB1090 on Table (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 165-153 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-19 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |