NH HB1088 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employee protections from COVID-19 in the workplace.
Title
Relative to employee protections from COVID-19 in the workplace.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2022 11:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2022 10:30 a.m. State HouseReps Hall |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |