NH HB1086 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to concealment of a cause of action.
Title
Relative to concealment of a cause of action.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/14/2022; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/15/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-2; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-11-02 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |