NH HB108 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-29 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
Pending: House Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services Committee
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-29 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
Pending: House Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services Committee
Summary
Establishing an employers' private right of action to enforce the payment of workers' compensation coverage.
Title
Establishing an employers' private right of action to enforce the payment of workers' compensation coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-01-13 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.413 | |
2010-01-06 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Date in Regular Calendar Order; House Journal 6, PG.310 | |
2009-11-25 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 Regular Calendar (vote 14-3); House Calendar 2, PG.96 | |
2009-11-20 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/24/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2009-09-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2009 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2009-03-19 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-03-12 | House Executive Session: 3/18/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2009-03-10 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/17/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2009-03-05 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/12/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2009-02-04 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/19/2009 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2009-02-04 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2009 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2009-01-30 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2009 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 101 | |
2009-01-14 | House Public Hearing: 1/29/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2009-01-07 | House Introduced 1/7/2009 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 8, PG. 122 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=466&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |