NH HB1078 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to budget procedures of the Gunstock Area Commission.
Title
Relative to budget procedures of the Gunstock Area Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-02 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |