NH HB1077 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Lay HB1077 on Table (Rep. Alexander Jr.): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-147 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the prohibition on conversion therapy for minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the prohibition on conversion therapy for minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-16 - House - Table (Y: 197 N: 147 NV: 21 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-17HouseLay HB1077 on Table (Rep. Alexander Jr.): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-147 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
2022-03-09HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2022-03-09HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0921h ( New Title) (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar)
2022-03-01HouseExecutive Session: 03/07/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2022-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 02/15/2022 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2021-11-02HouseTo Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback