NH HB1076 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Lay HB1076 on Table (): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 169-152 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Lay HB1076 on Table (): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 169-152 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to illegal productivity quotas.
Title
Relative to illegal productivity quotas.
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Adjutant [D] | Rep. Maria Perez [D] | Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] | Rep. Eric Gallager [D] |
Rep. Tony Caplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - Remove from Table (Y: 165 N: 171 NV: 24 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Table (Y: 169 N: 152 NV: 39 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Table (Y: 169 N: 152 NV: 39 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Lay HB1076 on Table (): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 169-152 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | House | Remove from Table (Rep. Adjutant): Motion Failed DV 165-171 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0630h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2022 11:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 3:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-11-02 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |