NH HB1073 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifying attorney exemptions under RSA 91-A.
Title
Modifying attorney exemptions under RSA 91-A.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/21/2022; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 04/14/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0689h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-17 | House | Amendment # 2022-0689h : Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0689h (NT) (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 03:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-11-02 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |