NH HB1071 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 171-149 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 171-149 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to wake surfing.
Title
Relative to wake surfing.
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Gottling [D] | Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] | Rep. John MacDonald [R] | Rep. Joyce Weston [D] |
Rep. Linda Tanner [D] | Rep. Karen Ebel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 171-149 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-02-09 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2022 1:45 p.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-11-02 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |