NH HB1065 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Lay HB1065 on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted DV 180-150 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Lay HB1065 on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted DV 180-150 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of art therapists.
Title
Relative to the regulation of art therapists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-20 | House | Lay HB1065 on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted DV 180-150 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0137h |
2022-03-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-12 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 10:45 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-02 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |