NH HB1063 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle speed within 10 miles per hour of the speed limit.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle speed within 10 miles per hour of the speed limit.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Hynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 24 |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/13/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 15 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Transportation |