NH HB1055 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the property tax exemption for individuals with disabilities and individuals who are deaf or severely hearing impaired.
Title
Relative to the property tax exemption for individuals with disabilities and individuals who are deaf or severely hearing impaired.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 9:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-16 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |