NH HB105 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to domicile residency, voter registration, and investigation of voter verification letters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to domicile residency, voter registration, and investigation of voter verification letters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - OTP (Y: 209 N: 155 NV: 11 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Table (Y: 153 N: 212 NV: 10 Abs: 25) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-11SenateHearing: 04/17/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 209-155 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 23
2019-03-07HouseLay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 153-212 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 23
2019-02-19HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-19HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 10
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 37

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback