NH HB1049 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study landfill siting criteria and methods for reducing pressure on landfill capacity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study landfill siting criteria and methods for reducing pressure on landfill capacity.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-05SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11
2022-04-26SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18
2022-04-20SenateHearing: 04/26/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 17
2022-03-01SenateIntroduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5
2022-02-23HouseAmendment # 2022-0269h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
2022-02-16HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2022-0269h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
2022-02-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0269h (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
2022-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301--303
2022-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2022 11:15 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303
2021-11-02HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Environment and Agriculture

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback