NH HB104 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Lay HB104 on Table (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted DV 345-28 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to multi-stall bathrooms and locker rooms in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to multi-stall bathrooms and locker rooms in schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16HouseLay HB104 on Table (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted DV 345-28 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 39
2023-03-03HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation 02/16/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 12
2023-03-01HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-02-08HouseExecutive Session: 02/15/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-01-31HousePublic Hearing: 02/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2022-12-23HouseIntroduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Education

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback