NH HB104 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB104
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-15 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-15 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of personal rapid transit systems and unconventional public transit methods.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of personal rapid transit systems and unconventional public transit methods.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened. |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98796113084 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 35 |
Same As/Similar To
HB104 (Carry Over) 2021-09-15 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened.