NH HB1039 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 254; I. Sec 5-6 eff. 7/01/2022 II. Rem eff. 8/23/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 254; I. Sec 5-6 eff. 7/01/2022 II. Rem eff. 8/23/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of "beverage manufacturer retail outlet," certain liquor licenses and fees, including beer and specialty beverage festival licenses, relative to direct to consumer shipments of alcohol.
Title
Relative to the definition of "beverage manufacturer retail outlet," certain liquor licenses and fees, including beer and specialty beverage festival licenses, relative to direct to consumer shipments of alcohol.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 254; I. Sec 5-6 eff. 7/01/2022 II. Rem eff. 8/23/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-12 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1799s and 2022-1946s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment # 2022-1946s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1799s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove HB 1039 from the Consent Calendar; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1799s, 05/05/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0284h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0284h (NT) (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2022 1:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-02-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |