NH HB1029 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/18/2022; Chapter 22; EFF.04/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/18/2022; Chapter 22; EFF.04/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Claremont police commission.
Title
Relative to the Claremont police commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew O'Hearne [D] | Rep. Gary Merchant [D] | Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] | Rep. John Cloutier [D] |
Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/18/2022; Chapter 22; EFF.04/18/2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 03/31/2022 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 03/31/2022); Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/14/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |