NH HB1014 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Public Hearing: 01/27/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jan 27 @ 11:00 am in Legislative Office Building 206-208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing public meetings to be conducted virtually.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing public meetings to be conducted virtually.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HousePublic Hearing: 01/27/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2021-10-29HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback